TN HB0727 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-17 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 353
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, requires a student's parent or legal guardian, or the student if the student has reached the age of majority, to provide certain consent before the student may engage in certain activities at school. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1; Title 49, Chapter 2; Title 49, Chapter 6 and Title 68.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, Chapter 1; Title 49, Chapter 2; Title 49, Chapter 6 and Title 68, relative to consent in educational events.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-17 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 353
2023-04-19HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2023-04-19HouseComp. SB subst.
2023-04-13HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/17/2023
2023-04-12HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/13/2023
2023-04-12HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2023-04-05HousePlaced on cal. Education Administration for 4/12/2023
2023-04-05HouseAction def. in Education Administration to 4/12/2023
2023-04-04HouseSponsor change.
2023-03-29HousePlaced on cal. Education Administration for 4/5/2023
2023-03-28HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Administration
2023-03-22HousePlaced on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/28/2023
2023-03-15HousePlaced on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/21/2023
2023-02-01HouseAssigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee
2023-02-01HouseP2C, ref. to Education Administration
2023-01-30HouseIntro., P1C.
2023-01-27HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1443 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-17 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2023

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback