TN SB1412 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-15 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-15 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, adds to the duties of the attorney general and reporter, the duty to defend any action of any political subdivision for adherence to the duties imposed on the political subdivision by statute or provision of the state or federal constitutions. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 6 and Title 36, Chapter 3.
Title
As introduced, adds to the duties of the attorney general and reporter, the duty to defend any action of any political subdivision for adherence to the duties imposed on the political subdivision by statute or provision of the state or federal constitutions. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 6 and Title 36, Chapter 3.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Bell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-15 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1195 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-13 - Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB1412&ga=111 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Bill/SB1412.pdf |