TN SB1403 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, allows the governing body of a public charter school to make the annual progress report to the sponsor of the school, the chartering authority, and the commissioner of education in an electronic format. - Amends TCA Title 49.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, allows the governing body of a public charter school to make the annual progress report to the sponsor of the school, the chartering authority, and the commissioner of education in an electronic format. - Amends TCA Title 49.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-28SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
2018-03-21SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/28/2018
2018-03-21SenateAction deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/28/2018
2018-03-14SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/21/2018
2017-03-29SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
2017-03-22SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/29/2017
2017-02-13SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
2017-02-09SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2017-02-09SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1238 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-21 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee of Education Instruction & Programs

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback