TN SB1389 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 154
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 154
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires a political subdivision that imposes requirements or expectations related to the type of clean or renewable energy used by a public utility in an ordinance, resolution, or other regulation to include certain sources of energy as permissible sources of clean or renewable energy. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 13; Title 64; Title 65; Title 67 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 13; Title 64; Title 65; Title 67 and Title 68, relative to energy.
Sponsors
Sen. Steve Southerland [R] | Sen. Janince Bowling [R] | Sen. Paul Rose [R] | Sen. Edward Jackson [R] |
Sen. Page Walley [R] | Sen. Dawn White [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-08 - Senate - SENATE ENERGY, AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 2 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-18 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 154 | |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/23/2023 |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 2 PNV 0 |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 3/8/2023 |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0946 (Crossfiled) 2023-04-18 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2023