TN SB1377 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 312
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 312
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, makes changes to present law concerning residential and energy codes. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 3; Title 13, Chapter 19 and Title 68, Chapter 120.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 3; Title 13, Chapter 19 and Title 68, Chapter 120, relative to residential and energy codes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-21 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-03 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 312 | |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/10/2023 |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0 |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/21/2023 |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/21/2023 |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/20/2023 |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/21/2023 |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/14/2023 |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Reset on Final calendar of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 2/28/2023 |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
Same As/Similar To
HB0799 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-03 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2023