TN SB1348 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-05 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires any local agency transferring up to 50 percent of its state-aid road funds to assist in any bridge improvements to notify the department of transportation at least 30 days in advance of the transfer. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8; Title 9; Title 54; Title 55 and Title 67.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires any local agency transferring up to 50 percent of its state-aid road funds to assist in any bridge improvements to notify the department of transportation at least 30 days in advance of the transfer. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8; Title 9; Title 54; Title 55 and Title 67.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-05HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2017-05-04SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2017-05-04SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2017-05-04SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 29, Nays 1
2017-05-04SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0441)
2017-05-02SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 5/4/2017
2017-05-01SenateSenate Reset on calendar for 5/4/2017
2017-04-27SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 5/1/2017
2017-04-27SenateSenate Reset on calendar for 5/1/2017
2017-04-25SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/27/2017
2017-04-17SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
2017-04-11SenatePlaced on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 4/17/2017
2017-03-29SenateAction deferred in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee to 4/3/2017
2017-03-28SenatePlaced on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/29/2017
2017-03-27SenateAction deferred in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee to 3/29/2017
2017-03-21SenatePlaced on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/27/2017
2017-03-20SenateAction deferred in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee to 3/27/2017
2017-03-14SenatePlaced on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/20/2017
2017-02-13SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
2017-02-09SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2017-02-09SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1352 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-08 - Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 1/1/2018

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback