TN HB1352 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-08 - Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 1/1/2018
Pending: House Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires any local agency transferring up to 50 percent of its state-aid road funds to assist in any bridge improvements to notify the department of transportation at least 30 days in advance of the transfer. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8; Title 9; Title 54; Title 55 and Title 67.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires any local agency transferring up to 50 percent of its state-aid road funds to assist in any bridge improvements to notify the department of transportation at least 30 days in advance of the transfer. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8; Title 9; Title 54; Title 55 and Title 67.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-08HouseAction Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 1/1/2018
2017-05-03HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 5/8/2017
2017-05-02HousePlaced behind the budget
2017-04-26HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 5/2/2017
2017-04-26HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
2017-04-18HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2017-04-12HousePlaced on cal. Transportation Committee for 4/18/2017
2017-04-11HouseAction def. in Transportation Committee to 4/18/2017
2017-04-05HousePlaced on cal. Transportation Committee for 4/11/2017
2017-04-04HouseAction def. in Transportation Committee to 4/11/2017
2017-03-29HousePlaced on cal. Transportation Committee for 4/4/2017
2017-03-28HouseAction def. in Transportation Committee to 4/4/2017
2017-03-22HousePlaced on cal. Transportation Committee for 3/28/2017
2017-03-22HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee
2017-03-15HousePlaced on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 3/22/2017
2017-03-15HouseAction Def. in s/c Transportation Subcommittee to 3/22/2017
2017-03-08HousePlaced on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 3/15/2017
2017-02-15HouseAssigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee
2017-02-15HouseP2C, ref. to Transportation Committee-- Finance, Ways & Means
2017-02-13HouseP1C.
2017-02-09HouseIntro.
2017-02-09HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB1348 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-05 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback