TN SB1342 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-05 - Pub. Ch. 1031
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-05 - Pub. Ch. 1031
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, specifies that the legislative branch of state government and the judicial branch of state government maintain control of the state buildings occupied predominately by the legislative branch and the judicial branch, respectively. - Amends TCA Title 3; Title 4; Title 9, Chapter 4 and Title 12.
Title
As enacted, specifies that the legislative branch of state government and the judicial branch of state government maintain control of the state buildings occupied predominately by the legislative branch and the judicial branch, respectively. - Amends TCA Title 3; Title 4; Title 9, Chapter 4 and Title 12.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 5 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT Rule 39(3) AMEND# 2 BY McNally (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 60 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-20 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 70 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 67 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - House - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 4 BY Clemmons PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 65 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - House - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 2 BY Clemmons PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 66 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - House - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 3 BY Clemmons PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 64 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-30 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT Rule 39(3) AMEND# 2 BY McNally (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 60 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-20 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 70 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 67 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - House - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 4 BY Clemmons PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 65 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - House - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 2 BY Clemmons PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 66 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - House - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 3 BY Clemmons PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 64 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-30 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-05 | Pub. Ch. 1031 | |
2016-05-05 | Effective date(s) 04/28/2016 | |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2016-04-22 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 32, Nays 0 (Amendment 5 - HA1250) |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar calendar for 4/21/2016 |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-04-20 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 70, Nays 21, PNV 0 |
2016-04-20 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 5 - HA1250) |
2016-04-20 | House | Am. tabled. (Amendment 4 - HA1244) |
2016-04-20 | House | Am. tabled. (Amendment 3 - HA1243) |
2016-04-20 | House | Am. tabled. (Amendment 2 - HA1242) |
2016-04-20 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA1239) |
2016-04-20 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0969) |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA1052) |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/20/2016 |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/20/2016 |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/19/2016 |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/12/2016 |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/30/2016 |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State & Local Government Committee to 3/30/2016 |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/29/2016 |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/29/2016 |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/22/2016 |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/22/2016 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/15/2016 |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/31/2015 |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1365 (Crossfiled) 2016-05-05 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1031