TN SB1339 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-24 - P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-24 - P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires victim of domestic violence filing for order of protection and respondent to attend one hour of domestic violence counseling prior to hearing on the order; requires costs of counseling to be assessed against the respondent in certain cases. - Amends TCA Title 36, Chapter 3, Part 6.
Title
As introduced, requires victim of domestic violence filing for order of protection and respondent to attend one hour of domestic violence counseling prior to hearing on the order; requires costs of counseling to be assessed against the respondent in certain cases. - Amends TCA Title 36, Chapter 3, Part 6.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-24 | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. | |
2011-02-23 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-17 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1793 (Crossfiled) 2012-03-14 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Judiciary Subcommittee of Judiciary Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB1339&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/SB1339.pdf |