TN SB1337 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-22 - Pub. Ch. 356
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-22 - Pub. Ch. 356
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires mine owners to include man hours, in lieu of the tons mined, on an annual report to the department of labor and workforce development; defines the duties and responsibilities of a "qualified assistant" at a mine. - Amends TCA Title 59.
Title
As enacted, requires mine owners to include man hours, in lieu of the tons mined, on an annual report to the department of labor and workforce development; defines the duties and responsibilities of a "qualified assistant" at a mine. - Amends TCA Title 59.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Bailey [R] | Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-03 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - SENATE ENERGY, AG., AND NAT. RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - SENATE ENERGY, AG., AND NAT. RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-22 | Pub. Ch. 356 | |
2017-05-22 | Effective date(s) 05/11/2017 | |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2017-05-04 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2017-05-03 | House | Passed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2017-05-03 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0267) |
2017-05-03 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2017-03-27 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0139) |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/23/2017 |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 3/20/2017 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0138 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 356