TN SB1329 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 1062
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 1062
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, adds a "family recreation center" to the list of establishments within 1,000 feet of which an adult-oriented establishment or adult cabaret is prohibited from locating. - Amends TCA Title 7.
Title
As enacted, adds a "family recreation center" to the list of establishments within 1,000 feet of which an adult-oriented establishment or adult cabaret is prohibited from locating. - Amends TCA Title 7.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-03 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-03 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-29 | Pub. Ch. 1062 | |
2012-05-29 | Effective date(s) 05/21/12 | |
2012-05-21 | Signed by Governor | |
2012-05-09 | Transmitted to Gov. for action. | |
2012-05-09 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2012-05-08 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2012-05-04 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2012-05-01 | Passed H., Ayes 89, Nays 1, PNV 1 | |
2012-05-01 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA1199) | |
2012-05-01 | Subst. for comp. HB. | |
2012-04-12 | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. | |
2012-04-11 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2012-04-11 | Passed S. as am., Ayes 31, Nays 0, PNV 1 | |
2012-04-11 | S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA1134) | |
2012-04-09 | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/11/2012 | |
2012-04-03 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 | |
2012-03-28 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 4/3/2012 | |
2012-03-27 | Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 4/3/2012 | |
2012-03-21 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/27/2012 | |
2011-02-24 | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. | |
2011-02-23 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-17 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0101 (Crossfiled) 2012-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1062