TN SB1315 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, revises certain reckless endangerment provisions; establishes enhanced punishment for certain acts of reckless endangerment; establishes enhanced punishment for acts constituting "community terrorism." - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13 and Title 40, Chapter 35.
Title
As introduced, revises certain reckless endangerment provisions; establishes enhanced punishment for certain acts of reckless endangerment; establishes enhanced punishment for acts constituting "community terrorism." - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13 and Title 40, Chapter 35.
Sponsors
Sen. Sara Kyle [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1478 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-10 - Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/15/2020