TN HB1478 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to First Calendar of 2020
Pending: House Criminal Justice Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, revises certain reckless endangerment provisions; establishes enhanced punishment for certain acts of reckless endangerment; establishes enhanced punishment for acts constituting "community terrorism." - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13 and Title 40, Chapter 35.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, revises certain reckless endangerment provisions; establishes enhanced punishment for certain acts of reckless endangerment; establishes enhanced punishment for acts constituting "community terrorism." - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13 and Title 40, Chapter 35.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27HouseAction Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to First Calendar of 2020
2019-03-20HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/27/2019
2019-03-13HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Judiciary
2019-03-06HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/13/2019
2019-02-13HouseAssigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2019-02-11HouseP2C, ref. to Judiciary
2019-02-07HouseP1C.
2019-02-06HouseIntro.
2019-02-06HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1315 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback