TN SB1307 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 363
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 363
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, encourages the commission to prescribe high performance building requirements and other standards, and promulgate rules, which meet or exceed the 2005 Sustainable Design Guidelines that the commission implemented, that are necessary to ensure all state buildings perform in an energy efficient manner; revises other related provisions. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 11; Title 12; Title 13; Title 43 and Title 49, Chapter 17.
Title
As enacted, encourages the commission to prescribe high performance building requirements and other standards, and promulgate rules, which meet or exceed the 2005 Sustainable Design Guidelines that the commission implemented, that are necessary to ensure all state buildings perform in an energy efficient manner; revises other related provisions. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 11; Title 12; Title 13; Title 43 and Title 49, Chapter 17.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-10 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-22 | Senate | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 363 |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file) |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/17/2013 |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 2 |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 4/10/2013 |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 4/9/2013 |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 4/2/2013 |
2013-02-25 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1268 (Crossfiled) 2013-05-22 - Pub. Ch. 363