TN SB1302 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 983
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 983
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the department of children's services to develop guidelines on the best practices for identifying and reporting signs of child abuse, child sexual abuse, and human trafficking in which the victim is a child; requires the department of education to use the guidelines to identify child abuse training programs appropriate for teachers; requires local education agencies and public charter schools to ensure teachers complete a child abuse training program. - Amends TCA Title 37, Chapter 1, Part 4; Title 49, Chapter 5, Part 1; Title 63, Chapter 23; Title 63, Chapter 6, Part 2; Title 63, Chapter 7, Part 1 and Title 63, Chapter 9.
Title
As enacted, requires the department of children's services to develop guidelines on the best practices for identifying and reporting signs of child abuse, child sexual abuse, and human trafficking in which the victim is a child; requires the department of education to use the guidelines to identify child abuse training programs appropriate for teachers; requires local education agencies and public charter schools to ensure teachers complete a child abuse training program. - Amends TCA Title 37, Chapter 1, Part 4; Title 49, Chapter 5, Part 1; Title 63, Chapter 23; Title 63, Chapter 6, Part 2; Title 63, Chapter 7, Part 1 and Title 63, Chapter 9.
Sponsors
Sen. Lee Harris [D] | Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Concur House Amendment # 6 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO CONSIDER AMENDMENT # 6 BY HARDAWAY PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 82 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 6 BY HARDAWAY PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 86 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-03 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 38 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO CONSIDER AMENDMENT # 6 BY HARDAWAY PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 82 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 6 BY HARDAWAY PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 86 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-03 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 38 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-23 | Pub. Ch. 983 | |
2018-05-23 | Effective date(s) 05/21/2018 | |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2018-05-08 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 32, Nays 0 (Amendment 6 - HA1279) |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar 2 calendar for 4/24/2018 |
2018-04-23 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2018-04-19 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/23/2018 |
2018-04-19 | House | Reset on cal. for 4/23/2018 |
2018-04-19 | House | H. adopted am. 6 (HA1279) |
2018-04-19 | House | Am. 3 (HA1154) reconsidered, withdrawn. |
2018-04-19 | House | Motion to reconsider adopted. |
2018-04-19 | House | Motion to lift from table adopted. |
2018-04-18 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/19/2018 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate returned. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar calendar for 4/18/2018 |
2018-04-16 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2018-04-16 | House | Am. 5 (HA 1212) withdrawn. |
2018-04-16 | House | Am. 4 (HA1178) withdrawn. |
2018-04-16 | House | H. adopted am. 3 (HA1154) |
2018-04-10 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/16/2018 |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/10/2018 |
2018-04-09 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-04-04 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/9/2018 |
2018-04-03 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-03-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/3/2018 |
2018-03-28 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 4/4/2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/28/2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2017-05-09 | House | Re-ref. Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-05-08 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/8/2017 |
2017-05-03 | House | Re-ref. Calendar & Rules Committee |
2017-05-03 | House | Failed to pass H., Ayes 38, Nays 49, PNV 0 |
2017-05-03 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - HA0528) |
2017-05-03 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0192) |
2017-05-03 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0425) |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/24/2017 |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/24/2017 |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/20/2017 |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/12/2017 |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/12/2017 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/11/2017 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
Same As/Similar To
HB1337 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 983