TN HB1337 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-6)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 983
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-6)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 983
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the department of children's services to develop guidelines on the best practices for identifying and reporting signs of child abuse, child sexual abuse, and human trafficking in which the victim is a child; requires the department of education to use the guidelines to identify child abuse training programs appropriate for teachers; requires local education agencies and public charter schools to ensure teachers complete a child abuse training program. - Amends TCA Title 37, Chapter 1, Part 4; Title 49, Chapter 5, Part 1; Title 63, Chapter 23; Title 63, Chapter 6, Part 2; Title 63, Chapter 7, Part 1 and Title 63, Chapter 9.
Title
As enacted, requires the department of children's services to develop guidelines on the best practices for identifying and reporting signs of child abuse, child sexual abuse, and human trafficking in which the victim is a child; requires the department of education to use the guidelines to identify child abuse training programs appropriate for teachers; requires local education agencies and public charter schools to ensure teachers complete a child abuse training program. - Amends TCA Title 37, Chapter 1, Part 4; Title 49, Chapter 5, Part 1; Title 63, Chapter 23; Title 63, Chapter 6, Part 2; Title 63, Chapter 7, Part 1 and Title 63, Chapter 9.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-23 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 983 | |
2018-04-19 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-16 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-05-03 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2017-05-01 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/3/2017 |
2017-04-27 | House | Held on desk. |
2017-04-26 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/27/2017 |
2017-04-26 | House | Reset on next avail. cal. |
2017-04-26 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-04-26 | House | Sponsor(s) withdrawn. |
2017-04-24 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/26/2017 |
2017-04-24 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-04-24 | House | Reset on next avail. cal. |
2017-04-20 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/24/2017 |
2017-04-19 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/20/2017 |
2017-04-11 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/11/2017 |
2017-04-05 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-03-30 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/5/2017 |
2017-03-29 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2017-03-28 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/28/2017 |
2017-03-22 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/22/2017 |
2017-03-15 | House | Meeting Cancelled. Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 3/22/17 |
2017-03-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/15/2017 |
2017-03-08 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee |
2017-03-01 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/8/2017 |
2017-02-22 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee |
2017-02-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 2/22/2017 |
2017-02-15 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2017-02-15 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2017-02-13 | House | P1C. |
2017-02-09 | House | Intro. |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1302 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 983