TN SB1298 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-14 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-14 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires names of candidates representing statewide political parties and recognized minor parties to be listed alphabetically on partisan general election ballots instead of ordering by majority party, minor party, and recognized minor party prior to alphabetizing. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 5, Part 2.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 2, Chapter 5, Part 2, relative to the arrangement of names on ballots.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-14 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/14/2021 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/14/2021 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/13/2021 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1486 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-14 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.