TN SB1298 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-24 - P2C, ref. to S. GW,H&HR Comm.
Pending: Senate General Welfare, Health & Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-24 - P2C, ref. to S. GW,H&HR Comm.
Pending: Senate General Welfare, Health & Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits any private act hospital from conditioning receipt of medical staff privileges at such hospital or an affiliate of such hospital on any economic criteria unrelated to quality of care or professional competence. - Amends TCA Title 6; Title 7; Title 10; Title 56 and Title 68.
Title
As introduced, prohibits any private act hospital from conditioning receipt of medical staff privileges at such hospital or an affiliate of such hospital on any economic criteria unrelated to quality of care or professional competence. - Amends TCA Title 6; Title 7; Title 10; Title 56 and Title 68.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-24 | P2C, ref. to S. GW,H&HR Comm. | |
2011-02-23 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-16 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1655 (Crossfiled) 2011-03-04 - Assigned to s/c Commerce Subcommittee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB1298&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/SB1298.pdf |