TN SB1295 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-05 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-05 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the commissioner of health to revise the recommended treatment guidelines for prescribing opioids to reflect specialty specific guidelines for board certified specialty physicians by September 30, 2017 and annually thereafter. - Amends TCA Title 63, Chapter 1.
Title
As introduced, requires the commissioner of health to revise the recommended treatment guidelines for prescribing opioids to reflect specialty specific guidelines for board certified specialty physicians by September 30, 2017 and annually thereafter. - Amends TCA Title 63, Chapter 1.
Sponsors
Sen. Rusty Crowe [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-05 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 4/5/2017 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 4/5/2017 |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/29/2017 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/7/2017 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0956 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-17 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee