TN SB1294 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 246
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 246
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, prohibits a life insurance provider from canceling a life insurance policy based on genetic information, from requesting or requiring genetic testing as a condition of insurability, and from accessing the genetic data of an individual without consent. - Amends TCA Title 56, Chapter 7, Part 27.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 56, Chapter 7, Part 27, relative to genetic information.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Bailey [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-21 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-03 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 246 | |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/30/2023 |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/27/2023 |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/21/2023 |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/21/2023 |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/20/2023 |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/21/2023 |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/14/2023 |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1309 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-03 - Effective date(s) 04/25/2023, 07/01/2023