TN SB1260 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/27/2019
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Hearing: Mar 27 @ 2:30 pm in Cordell Hull Building
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires the office of research and education accountability (OREA) to study whether community schools are providing effective on-the-job training opportunities to students and file a report containing the findings, conclusions, and recommendations from the study with the education committees of the general assembly no later than January 1, 2020. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires the office of research and education accountability (OREA) to study whether community schools are providing effective on-the-job training opportunities to students and file a report containing the findings, conclusions, and recommendations from the study with the education committees of the general assembly no later than January 1, 2020. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-20SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/27/2019
2019-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-07SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0736 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-20 - Placed on cal. Education for 3/27/2019

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback