TN HB0736 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires the office of research and education accountability (OREA) to study whether community schools are providing effective on-the-job training opportunities to students and file a report containing the findings, conclusions, and recommendations from the study with the education committees of the general assembly no later than January 1, 2020. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires the office of research and education accountability (OREA) to study whether community schools are providing effective on-the-job training opportunities to students and file a report containing the findings, conclusions, and recommendations from the study with the education committees of the general assembly no later than January 1, 2020. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-13 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-13SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0
2020-02-13SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0197)
2020-02-13SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2019-04-17SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2019-04-16HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2019-04-15HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 0
2019-04-15HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0191)
2019-04-11HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/15/2019
2019-04-10HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/11/2019
2019-03-27HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-03-20HousePlaced on cal. Education for 3/27/2019
2019-03-20HouseNo Action Taken
2019-03-13HousePlaced on cal. Education for 3/20/2019
2019-03-13HouseNo Action Taken
2019-03-06HousePlaced on cal. Education for 3/13/2019
2019-03-06HouseNo Action Taken
2019-02-27HousePlaced on cal. Education for 3/6/2019
2019-02-26HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education
2019-02-20HousePlaced on s/c cal Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee for 2/26/2019
2019-02-11HouseAssigned to s/c Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee
2019-02-07HouseP2C, ref. to Education
2019-02-06HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-02-05HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1260 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-13 - Companion House Bill substituted

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback