TN SB1249 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-09 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-09 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, establishes a new pay scale for assistant district attorney generals based upon the assistant's number of years of credible service as an assistant; reclassifies into the new pay scale those assistants hired before July 1, 1994, who have 20 years credible service. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 7.
Title
As introduced, establishes a new pay scale for assistant district attorney generals based upon the assistant's number of years of credible service as an assistant; reclassifies into the new pay scale those assistants hired before July 1, 1994, who have 20 years credible service. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 7.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Norris [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-11 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-09 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/9/2017 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/8/2017 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/3/2017 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/3/2017 |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/2/2017 |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/11/2017 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/11/2017 |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/5/2017 |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/5/2017 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/4/2017 |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/28/2017 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/21/2017 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/21/2017 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/14/2017 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1250 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-08 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee