TN SB1248 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-21 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-21 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, permits an electronic format for the annual TennCare report on the use and cost of opioids and controlled substances in the program to the health committee of the house and the health and welfare committee of the senate. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 3; Title 39; Title 40; Title 43; Title 50; Title 53, Chapter 10; Title 53, Chapter 11; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
As introduced, permits an electronic format for the annual TennCare report on the use and cost of opioids and controlled substances in the program to the health committee of the house and the health and welfare committee of the senate. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 3; Title 39; Title 40; Title 43; Title 50; Title 53, Chapter 10; Title 53, Chapter 11; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-08 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Deferred to Summer Study (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-21 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/21/2016 |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/21/2016 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/16/2016 |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Deferred to Summer Study |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 4/8/2015 |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Reset on Final calendar of Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/25/2015 |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1284 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-30 - Taken off notice for cal. in Health Committee