TN SB1194 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-02 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-02 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases from 30 to 50 years the maximum period of time that an economic impact plan can provide for allocating property taxes to a county industrial development corporation. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 53, Part 3.
Title
As introduced, increases from 30 to 50 years the maximum period of time that an economic impact plan can provide for allocating property taxes to a county industrial development corporation. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 53, Part 3.
Sponsors
Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-24 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-24 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-02 | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. | |
2012-02-01 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2012-02-01 | Passed S., Ayes 31, Nays 0 | |
2012-01-30 | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 2/1/2012 | |
2012-01-30 | S. Reset on cal. for 2/1/12 | |
2012-01-26 | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 cal. for 1/30/2012 | |
2012-01-24 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm. | |
2012-01-18 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 1/24/2012 | |
2012-01-11 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 1/17/2012 | |
2011-03-04 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of S&L Govt Com. | |
2011-02-23 | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. | |
2011-02-17 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-16 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1269 (Crossfiled) 2011-03-29 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: State & Local Government Committee