TN SB1191 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 325
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 325
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, terminates the radiologic imaging and radiation therapy board of examiners; authorizes the board of medical examiners, to establish and issue limited and full X-ray certifications. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 63, Chapter 6.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 63, Chapter 6, relative to radiologic imaging and radiation therapy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-29 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-03 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 325 | |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/13/2023 |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 3/29/2023 |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Government Operations Committee |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Government Operations Committee to 3/29/2023 |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 3/22/2023 |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/8/2023 |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/8/2023 |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Sponsor change. |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/1/2023 |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1388 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-03 - Effective date(s) 04/28/2023