TN SB1164 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-11 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-11 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, permits students enrolled in an apprentice training program to be eligible for the Tennessee Promise scholarship if the students meet all requirements for the scholarship. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 4, Part 7 and Title 49, Chapter 4, Part 9.
Title
As introduced, permits students enrolled in an apprentice training program to be eligible for the Tennessee Promise scholarship if the students meet all requirements for the scholarship. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 4, Part 7 and Title 49, Chapter 4, Part 9.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-11 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/11/2015 |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1072 (Crossfiled) 2015-03-17 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee of Education Administration & Planning
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB1164&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/SB1164.pdf |