TN SB1153 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-19 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of Gov't Ops. Comm
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-19 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of Gov't Ops. Comm
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates department of juvenile justice. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8 and Title 37.
Title
As introduced, creates department of juvenile justice. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8 and Title 37.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-19 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of Gov't Ops. Comm | |
2009-05-14 | Placed on S. Govt. Ops. Comm. cal. for 05/19/2009 | |
2009-04-01 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Gov. Ops. Comm. | |
2009-02-18 | P2C, ref. to S. Govt. Ops. Comm. | |
2009-02-12 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-12 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1557 (Crossfiled) 2009-05-18 - Rcvd. from H., P1C.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB1153&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/SB1153.pdf |