TN HB1557 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-18 - Rcvd. from H., P1C.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-18 - Rcvd. from H., P1C.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates department of juvenile justice. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8 and Title 37.
Title
As introduced, creates department of juvenile justice. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8 and Title 37.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-18 | Rcvd. from H., P1C. | |
2009-05-14 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. | |
2009-05-14 | Passed H., as am., Ayes 92, Nays 1 | |
2009-05-14 | H. adopted am.(Amendment 2 of 0 - HA0458) | |
2009-05-11 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/14/09 | |
2009-05-11 | Reset on regular calendar for 5/14/09 | |
2009-05-11 | H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA0200) | |
2009-05-07 | Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/11/2009 | |
2009-05-05 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 05/07/2009 | |
2009-04-28 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2009-04-22 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 04/28/2009 | |
2009-04-22 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2009-04-15 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 04/22/2009 | |
2009-04-15 | Assigned to s/c Budget of FW&M | |
2009-04-15 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2009-04-08 | Placed on cal. Children and Family Affairs Committee for 04/15/2009 | |
2009-04-08 | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Children and Family Affairs Committee | |
2009-04-01 | Placed on s/c cal Domestic Relations of C&FA for 04/08/2009 | |
2009-03-11 | Assigned to s/c Domestic Relations of C&FA | |
2009-02-23 | P2C, ref. to Children & Family Affairs--Government Operations for review | |
2009-02-19 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-18 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1153 (Crossfiled) 2009-05-19 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of Gov't Ops. Comm
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1557&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB1557.pdf |