TN SB1129 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-23 - P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-23 - P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the district attorney general of each judicial district to report on child protective teams to the judiciary committees of the senate and house of representatives by February 15 of each year, rather than January 15. - Amends TCA Section 37-1-607.
Title
As introduced, requires the district attorney general of each judicial district to report on child protective teams to the judiciary committees of the senate and house of representatives by February 15 of each year, rather than January 15. - Amends TCA Section 37-1-607.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-23 | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. | |
2011-02-17 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-16 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1321 (Crossfiled) 2011-03-30 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Children and Family Affairs Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB1129&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/SB1129.pdf |