TN SB1110 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-18 - Pub. Ch. 380
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, prohibits the use of public funds, personnel, or property to enforce any federal law or regulation that regulates the ownership, use, or possession of firearms, ammunition, or firearms accessories, if the expenditure or use of the personnel or property would result in the violation of another Tennessee statute, Tennessee common law, or the Constitution of Tennessee. - Amends TCA Title 38, Chapter 3.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, prohibits the use of public funds, personnel, or property to enforce any federal law or regulation that regulates the ownership, use, or possession of firearms, ammunition, or firearms accessories, if the expenditure or use of the personnel or property would result in the violation of another Tennessee statute, Tennessee common law, or the Constitution of Tennessee. - Amends TCA Title 38, Chapter 3.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-13 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 74 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-18 Pub. Ch. 380
2015-05-18 Effective date(s) 04/30/2015
2015-04-30SenateSigned by Governor.
2015-04-20SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2015-04-16HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2015-04-15SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2015-04-14SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2015-04-13HousePassed H., Ayes 74, Nays 20, PNV 1
2015-04-13HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0263)
2015-04-13HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2015-04-13SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2015-04-13SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 29, Nays 1, PNV 1
2015-04-13SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0365)
2015-04-10SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/13/2015
2015-04-09SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2015-04-07SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 0
2015-04-01SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/7/2015
2015-03-10SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to last calendar
2015-03-04SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/10/2015
2015-02-18SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2015-02-12SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2015-02-12SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1341 (Crossfiled) 2015-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 380

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback