TN HB1341 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 380
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, prohibits the use of public funds, personnel, or property to enforce any federal law or regulation that regulates the ownership, use, or possession of firearms, ammunition, or firearms accessories, if the expenditure or use of the personnel or property would result in the violation of another Tennessee statute, Tennessee common law, or the Constitution of Tennessee. - Amends TCA Title 38, Chapter 3.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, prohibits the use of public funds, personnel, or property to enforce any federal law or regulation that regulates the ownership, use, or possession of firearms, ammunition, or firearms accessories, if the expenditure or use of the personnel or property would result in the violation of another Tennessee statute, Tennessee common law, or the Constitution of Tennessee. - Amends TCA Title 38, Chapter 3.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-18 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 380
2015-04-13HouseComp. SB subst.
2015-04-13HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2015-04-09HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/13/2015
2015-04-08HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/9/2015
2015-04-01HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2015-03-31HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2015-03-25HousePlaced on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/31/2015
2015-03-25HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee
2015-03-18HousePlaced on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/25/2015
2015-03-18HouseReset on Final cal. of Civil Justice Subcommittee
2015-03-11HousePlaced on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/18/2015
2015-03-11HouseAction Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 3/18/2015
2015-03-09HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2015-03-04HousePlaced on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/11/2015
2015-02-25HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2015-02-24HouseAssigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
2015-02-23HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2015-02-23HouseP2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee
2015-02-18HouseP1C.
2015-02-12HouseIntro.
2015-02-12HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB1110 (Crossfiled) 2015-05-18 - Pub. Ch. 380

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback