TN SB1093 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-22 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-22 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the governor to transmit copies of federal executive orders to the joint government operations committee for review and to recommend to the general assembly whether further action should be taken based on the recommendation. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 58.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4 and Title 58, relative to executive orders.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0912 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-09 - Sponsor(s) Added.