TN HB0912 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-09 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-09 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the governor to transmit copies of federal executive orders to the joint government operations committee for review and to recommend to the general assembly whether further action should be taken based on the recommendation. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 58.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4 and Title 58, relative to executive orders.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-09 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Public Service Subcommittee |
2021-02-22 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2021-02-11 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-10 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1093 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-22 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee