TN SB1091 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, deletes the deadline of August 1, 2010, by which the controlled substance database advisory committee is to develop a form that healthcare providers may use to make reports regarding unlawful attempts to obtain controlled substances. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29; Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4; Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13; Title 40; Title 50; Title 53, Chapter 11; Title 67 and Title 68.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, deletes the deadline of August 1, 2010, by which the controlled substance database advisory committee is to develop a form that healthcare providers may use to make reports regarding unlawful attempts to obtain controlled substances. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29; Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4; Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13; Title 40; Title 50; Title 53, Chapter 11; Title 67 and Title 68.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-06SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0573 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-07 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback