TN SB1082 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-21 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-21 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires that a deed for the conveyance of real property be prepared and filed by a licensed attorney, title insurance agent, or the owner of the property; requires the county register to verify that an affidavit on a deed of conveyance of real property was duly signed and notarized stating under oath the name and address of the preparer; requires the register to refuse to register any deed of conveyance of real property that is not prepared by a licensed attorney, title insurance agent, or the owner of the real property. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 13; Title 23, Chapter 3; Title 66, Chapter 5, Part 1 and Title 66, Chapter 24.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8, Chapter 13; Title 23, Chapter 3; Title 66, Chapter 5, Part 1 and Title 66, Chapter 24, relative to conveyances of real property.
Sponsors
Sen. Sara Kyle [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-21 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/21/2023 |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1344 (Crossfiled) 2023-02-07 - Assigned to s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee