TN SB1047 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/15/2021
Pending: Senate Calendar Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, adds use of vapor products to the acts that are prohibited in enclosed public places under the Non-Smoker Protection Act. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, Chapter 17, relative to vapor products.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-13SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/15/2021
2021-04-07SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2021-04-07SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/7/2021
2021-04-06SenateAction deferred in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee to 4/7/2021
2021-03-30SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/6/2021
2021-03-30SenateAction deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 4/6/2021
2021-03-24SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/30/2021
2021-02-22SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
2021-02-11SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-02-10SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0705 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-08 - Re-ref. Calendar & Rules Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback