TN HB0705 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Comp. SB subst.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, adds use of vapor products to the acts that are prohibited in enclosed public places under the Non-Smoker Protection Act. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, Chapter 17, relative to vapor products.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-29HouseComp. SB subst.
2021-04-26HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/29/2021
2021-04-26HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/26/2021
2021-04-08HouseRe-ref. Calendar & Rules Committee
2021-04-01HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/8/21
2021-04-01HouseReset on cal. for 4/8/2021
2021-03-25HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/1/2021
2021-03-24HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/25/2021
2021-03-17HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2021-03-10HousePlaced on cal. Health Committee for 3/17/2021
2021-03-09HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Health Committee
2021-03-03HousePlaced on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/9/2021
2021-02-20HouseAssigned to s/c Health Subcommittee
2021-02-11HouseP2C, ref. to Health Committee
2021-02-10HouseIntro., P1C.
2021-02-09HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1047 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-04 - Concurred, Ayes 23, Nays 6 (Amendment 1 - HA0305)

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback