TN SB1047 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-20 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, clarifies the "Taxpayer Bill of Rights" provision requiring the department to keep confidential the financial information provided by a taxpayer. - Amends TCA Title 67.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, clarifies the "Taxpayer Bill of Rights" provision requiring the department to keep confidential the financial information provided by a taxpayer. - Amends TCA Title 67.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-20SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2019-03-26SenateRefer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee w/ negative recommendation, as amended
2019-03-19SenatePlaced on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/26/2019
2019-03-19SenateAction deferred in Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee to 3/26/2019
2019-03-12SenatePlaced on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/19/2019
2019-02-19SenateRefer to Senate F,W&M Revenue Subcommittee
2019-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-06SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1061 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-27 - Action Def. in s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee to First Calendar of 2020

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback