TN HB1061 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Action Def. in s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee to First Calendar of 2020
Pending: House Property & Planning Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, clarifies the "Taxpayer Bill of Rights" provision requiring the department to keep confidential the financial information provided by a taxpayer. - Amends TCA Title 67.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, clarifies the "Taxpayer Bill of Rights" provision requiring the department to keep confidential the financial information provided by a taxpayer. - Amends TCA Title 67.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27HouseAction Def. in s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee to First Calendar of 2020
2019-03-21HousePlaced on s/c cal Property & Planning Subcommittee for 3/27/2019
2019-03-18HouseAssigned to s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee
2019-03-18HouseRef. to Local Committee
2019-02-11HouseP2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
2019-02-07HouseP1C.
2019-02-06HouseIntro.
2019-02-06HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1047 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-20 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback