TN SB1007 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - Pub. Ch. 149
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - Pub. Ch. 149
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes the Beech River watershed development authority to develop or provide for the development of residential and commercial property existing within the Beech River system. - Amends TCA Title 64, Chapter 1, Part 1.
Title
As enacted, authorizes the Beech River watershed development authority to develop or provide for the development of residential and commercial property existing within the Beech River system. - Amends TCA Title 64, Chapter 1, Part 1.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - Senate - S. ENERGY, AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES : Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - Senate - S. E,A&NR COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - Senate - S. ENERGY, AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES : Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - Senate - S. E,A&NR COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-24 | House | Pub. Ch. 149 |
2013-04-24 | House | Effective date(s) 04/12/2013 |
2013-04-12 | House | Signed by Governor. |
2013-04-02 | House | Transmitted to Gov. for action. |
2013-03-27 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2013-03-26 | House | Signed by S. Speaker |
2013-03-26 | House | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2013-03-25 | House | Passed H., Ayes 97, Nays 0 |
2013-03-25 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2013-03-25 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Passed S., Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 cal. for 3/4/2013 |
2013-03-01 | Senate | S. Placed on consent cal. 2 for Monday, 3-4-13 |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm. |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Placed on S. E,A&NR Comm. cal. for 2/27/2013 |
2013-02-06 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. E,A&NR Comm. |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0840 (Crossfiled) 2013-04-24 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 149