TN SB1000 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - Pub. Ch. 326
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - Pub. Ch. 326
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires TACIR to study current homestead exemption amounts to determine whether the amounts should be increased to reflect the cost of living. - Amends TCA Title 26, Chapter 2.
Title
As enacted, requires TACIR to study current homestead exemption amounts to determine whether the amounts should be increased to reflect the cost of living. - Amends TCA Title 26, Chapter 2.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-06 | Pub. Ch. 326 | |
2015-05-06 | Effective date(s) 04/28/2015 | |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2015-04-16 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2015-04-13 | House | Passed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2015-04-13 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2015-03-23 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 3/19/2015 |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/17/2015 |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1093 (Crossfiled) 2015-05-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 326