TN SB0994 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-04 - Pub. Ch. 28
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-04 - Pub. Ch. 28
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises various provisions in higher education to include all state governing boards and not just the board of regents or the UT system due to the implementation of the FOCUS Act. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 14; Section 49-7-118 and Title 49, Chapter 7, Part 30.
Title
As enacted, revises various provisions in higher education to include all state governing boards and not just the board of regents or the UT system due to the implementation of the FOCUS Act. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 14; Section 49-7-118 and Title 49, Chapter 7, Part 30.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Tracy [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-04 | Pub. Ch. 28 | |
2017-04-04 | Effective date(s) 03/29/2017 | |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2017-03-20 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2017-03-16 | House | Passed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2017-03-16 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0052) |
2017-03-16 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2017-03-09 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0063) |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/6/2017 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/1/2017 |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/1/2017 |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 2/22/2017 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1004 (Crossfiled) 2017-04-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 28