TN SB0978 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-06 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate F,W&M Revenue Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, enacts the "Tennessee Legal Tender Act," which provides that coins having gold or silver contents and certain refined gold or silver bullion are legal tender of this state if issued by the U.S. government or if a court delcares that states may declare such as legal tender; exempts sale of such tender from Hall income and sales tax. - Amends TCA Title 9 and Title 67.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, enacts the "Tennessee Legal Tender Act," which provides that coins having gold or silver contents and certain refined gold or silver bullion are legal tender of this state if issued by the U.S. government or if a court delcares that states may declare such as legal tender; exempts sale of such tender from Hall income and sales tax. - Amends TCA Title 9 and Title 67.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-06SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate F,W&M Revenue Subcommittee
2019-02-12SenateRefer to Senate F,W&M Revenue Subcommittee
2019-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-06SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1323 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-13 - Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback