TN SB0966 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-21 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-21 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires TACIR to study and report on the feasibility and costs of providing greater access to mobile communications systems in rural Tennessee for elementary and secondary school personnel, law enforcement officers, firefighters, and first responders; requires TACIR to report its findings to the governor and speakers of the senate and house of representatives on or before January 1, 2018. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 9 and Title 65.
Title
As introduced, requires TACIR to study and report on the feasibility and costs of providing greater access to mobile communications systems in rural Tennessee for elementary and secondary school personnel, law enforcement officers, firefighters, and first responders; requires TACIR to report its findings to the governor and speakers of the senate and house of representatives on or before January 1, 2018. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 9 and Title 65.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-21 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/21/2017 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1088 (Crossfiled) 2017-02-15 - Assigned to s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee