TN SB0930 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-22 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-22 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, adds a reference to the statute listing the type of information that must be contained in litter reports submitted by citizens. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 54, Chapter 1, Part 4; Title 55, Chapter 10; Section 57-5-201; Section 67-4-402 and Title 68, Chapter 211.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 54, Chapter 1, Part 4; Title 55, Chapter 10; Section 57-5-201; Section 67-4-402 and Title 68, Chapter 211, relative to litter prevention and control.
Sponsors
Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1209 (Crossfiled) 2022-02-15 - Sponsor(s) Added.