TN SB0915 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 564
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 564
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, creates a right of appeal in an action brought against this state, a department or agency of this state, or an official of this state in their official capacity that challenges the constitutionality of a state statute, whereby the state may appeal as of right from an interlocutory order of a circuit or chancery court of this state that grants, continues, or modifies an injunction or denies a motion to dissolve or modify an injunction. - Amends TCA Title 1; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8; Title 9; Title 20; Title 27; Title 28; Title 29; Title 47 and Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 1; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8; Title 9; Title 20; Title 27; Title 28; Title 29; Title 47 and Title 49, relative to actions against the state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-06 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 3 PNV 0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-02 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 564 | |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/26/2021 |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/26/2021 |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/19/2021 |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 3 PNV 0 |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/6/2021 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1072 (Crossfiled) 2021-06-02 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2021