TN HB1072 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, creates a right of appeal in an action brought against this state, a department or agency of this state, or an official of this state in their official capacity that challenges the constitutionality of a state statute, whereby the state may appeal as of right from an interlocutory order of a circuit or chancery court of this state that grants, continues, or modifies an injunction or denies a motion to dissolve or modify an injunction. - Amends TCA Title 1; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8; Title 9; Title 20; Title 27; Title 28; Title 29; Title 47 and Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 1; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8; Title 9; Title 20; Title 27; Title 28; Title 29; Title 47 and Title 49, relative to actions against the state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-05 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 17 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 6 (Y: 71 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 64 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 64 N: 26 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 6 (Y: 71 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 64 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 64 N: 26 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-02 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2021 | |
2021-06-02 | Pub. Ch. 564 | |
2021-05-26 | Signed by Governor. | |
2021-05-14 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-05-11 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-05-07 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2021-05-05 | House | H. concurred in S. am. no. 6 HB1072 Ayes 71, Nays 21, PNV 0 |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 17, Nays 10 |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Senate Amendments 2, 3, 4, and 5 withdrawn. |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment #6 (SA0462) |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 5/5/2021 |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 5/5/2021 |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 5/4/2021 |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 5/4/2021 |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 5/3/2021 |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 5/3/2021 |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/29/2021 |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/28/2021 |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/28/2021 |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Failed to adopt, Ayes 14, Nays 14 (Amendment 1 - SA0257) |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-04-26 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2021-04-26 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 64, Nays 26, PNV 3 |
2021-04-26 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0314) |
2021-04-22 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/26/2021 |
2021-04-21 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/22/2021 |
2021-04-14 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 4/14/2021 |
2021-04-06 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-30 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2021-03-30 | House | Ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2021-02-24 | House | Sponsor change. |
2021-02-22 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2021-02-22 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-11 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-10 | House | Sponsor(s) withdrawn. |
2021-02-10 | House | Sponsor change. |
2021-02-10 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0915 (Crossfiled) 2021-06-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 564