TN SB0913 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-13 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-13 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, allows members of the board of directors for the bureau of ethics and campaign finance to also receive electronic notice of any special meeting being called by the board's chair, in addition to the written notice required to be delivered personally or left at the member's residence under present law. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 10; Title 3; Title 4, Chapter 55 and Title 8, Chapter 50.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 2, Chapter 10; Title 3; Title 4, Chapter 55 and Title 8, Chapter 50, relative to ethics.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/13/2021 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0960 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-22 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.