TN SB0902 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-21 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Jud Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-21 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Jud Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, allows a tenant who is the victim of domestic abuse, sexual assault, or stalking to terminate a residential lease agreement upon submitting certain proof to the landlord in writing and vacating the premises. - Amends TCA Title 66, Chapter 7, Part 1.
Title
As introduced, allows a tenant who is the victim of domestic abuse, sexual assault, or stalking to terminate a residential lease agreement upon submitting certain proof to the landlord in writing and vacating the premises. - Amends TCA Title 66, Chapter 7, Part 1.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-21 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Jud Comm. | |
2010-04-21 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 04/21/2010 | |
2010-04-20 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 4/21/2010 | |
2010-04-14 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 04/20/2010 | |
2010-04-14 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 4/21/2010 | |
2010-04-14 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 04/14/2010 | |
2010-04-13 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 4/14/2010 | |
2010-04-08 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 04/13/2010 | |
2010-04-06 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 4/13/2010 | |
2010-04-01 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 04/06/2010 | |
2009-05-13 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Jud Comm. | |
2009-05-13 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 05/13/2009 | |
2009-05-12 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 5/13/2009 | |
2009-05-07 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 05/12/2009 | |
2009-05-06 | Action def. in Jud. Comm to 5-12-09 | |
2009-05-05 | Placed on Jud. Comm cal. for 5/6/09 | |
2009-05-05 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 5/6/2009 | |
2009-05-01 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 05/05/2009 | |
2009-02-18 | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. | |
2009-02-12 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-11 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0323 (Crossfiled) 2010-04-07 - Failed for Lack of Motion in: Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0902&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/SB0902.pdf |